MN SF2843 | 2009-2010 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - Senate: HF substituted on Calendar HF3067
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-26 - Senate: HF substituted on Calendar HF3067
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Watershed management organization draft plan hearing and submission requirements modifications
Title
Watershed management organization draft plan hearing and submission requirements modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Senate: HF substituted on Calendar HF3067 | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: General Orders: To pass | |
2010-03-23 | Senate: Second reading | |
2010-03-23 | Senate: Comm report: To pass | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Introduction and first reading | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Referred to Environment and Natural Resources |
Minnesota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/revisor/pages/search_status/status_detail.php?b=Senate&f=SF2843&ssn=0&y=2009 |
Text | https://www.revisor.mn.gov/data/senate/bills/ls86/2800/S2843.0.pdf |