MN SF966 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF819
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF819
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
X-ray practice of cardiovascular technologists education requirements authorization
Title
X-ray practice of cardiovascular technologists education requirements authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Carla Nelson [R] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. Jeff Hayden [D] |
Sen. Scott Jensen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF819 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Second reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF819 (Similar To) 2019-05-06 - Secretary of State Chapter 17 05/03/2019