MO HB1213 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the Bi-State Development Agency, vacation leave for state employees, Department of Revenue fee offices, advisory board association, and conveyance of state property
Title
Changes the laws regarding the Bi-State Development Agency, vacation leave for state employees, Department of Revenue fee offices, advisory board association, and conveyance of state property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-26 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-26 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-23 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-04-23 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-17 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-17 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Rules - Returned to the Committee of Origin (H) - RETURNED TO COMMITTEE AS HB 1213 | |
2012-04-12 | Rules - Voted to Return to Committee of Origin (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-10 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-04-10 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-27 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Referred: Transportation Funding and Public Institutions (H) | |
2012-01-10 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-09 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |