MO HB1512 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Civil Liberties Defense Act which specifies how courts may rule in contractual disputes involving the laws of other countries and in jurisdictional issues involving other countries
Title
Establishes the Civil Liberties Defense Act which specifies how courts may rule in contractual disputes involving the laws of other countries and in jurisdictional issues involving other countries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-30 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, MAY 1, 1:30PM, SCR 1 | |
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: General Laws (S) | |
2012-03-29 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-29 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 110 NOES: 042 | |
2012-03-27 | Perfected (H) - AYES: 110 NOES: 046 | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-20 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-20 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-02 | Referred: Judiciary (H) | |
2012-01-26 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-25 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |