MO HB154 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions for utility ratemaking
Title
Modifies provisions for utility ratemaking
Sponsors
Rep. Don Rone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |