MO HB1593 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to proceedings against defaulting collectors
Title
Modifies provisions relating to proceedings against defaulting collectors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: HB 1593 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: HB 1593 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass Consent |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 31, 2016, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Ways and Means(S) |
2016-02-15 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-02-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-15 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-10 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2016-01-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |