MO HB1690 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-01 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-01 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding arrearages and the expungement of certain records related to criminal nonsupport
Title
Changes the laws regarding arrearages and the expungement of certain records related to criminal nonsupport
Sponsors
Sen. Karla May [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-05-01 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-05-01 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-16 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-04-16 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Referred: General Laws (H) | |
2012-02-09 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1690&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1690I.htm |