MO HB1692 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the oath that an election judge takes prior to being commissioned or beginning duties by requiring them to swear to support and defend the Constitution of the United States and Missouri
Title
Revises the oath that an election judge takes prior to being commissioned or beginning duties by requiring them to swear to support and defend the Constitution of the United States and Missouri
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-30 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-24 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 26, 5:00PM, OR UPON NEXT OCCURING RECESS OF THE SENATE, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-04-23 | Hearing Cancelled (S) | |
2012-04-19 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, APRIL 23, UPON ADJOURNMENT, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence (S) | |
2012-03-29 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 0 | |
2012-03-27 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Referred: Elections (H) | |
2012-02-09 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |