MO HB1846 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-26 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding referrals for MO HealthNet-funded home- and community-based care
Title
Changes the laws regarding referrals for MO HealthNet-funded home- and community-based care
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Long [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-26 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-26 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-23 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-04-23 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-18 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-18 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-04 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-04-02 | Public Hearing Continued (H) | |
2012-03-19 | Refer: Spec Stand Com Government Oversight & Accountability | |
2012-02-29 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-28 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |