MO HB1870 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that by January 1, 2014, the official ballot will be a paper ballot and requires all voting methods to produce the election results from paper ballots
Title
Specifies that by January 1, 2014, the official ballot will be a paper ballot and requires all voting methods to produce the election results from paper ballots
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-04-17 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred: Elections (H) | |
2012-03-05 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1870&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1870I.htm |