MO HB1877 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-15 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-15 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the child abuse and neglect central registry and the reentry of children previously released from Children's Division custody
Title
Changes the laws regarding the child abuse and neglect central registry and the reentry of children previously released from Children's Division custody
Sponsors
Rep. David Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 1877 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 151 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 1877 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: HB 1877 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 151 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 1877 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: HB 1877 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 151 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2016-06-15 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2016-05-10 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-05-10 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 147 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-10 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS as amended AYES: 151 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-10 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-26 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2 adopted AYES: 29 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) - SA 1, SA 2 adopted |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 15, 2016, 8:15am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 8, 2016, 8:15am, Senate Committee Room 2 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children(S) |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-02-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 151 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-18 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-16 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-02-16 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-04 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Social Services(H) |
2016-01-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Children and Families(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-17 | House | Prefiled (H) |