MO HB1906 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Placed Back on Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Placed Back on Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Senior Services Growth and Development Program to provide additional funding for senior services
Title
Establishes the Senior Services Growth and Development Program to provide additional funding for senior services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Placed Back on Perfection Calendar |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1906&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5651H.01I.pdf |