MO HB2044 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-24 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (S)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-24 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (S)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Incentives Regionalization Act to provide economic incentives to induce employers to relocate from Kansas to Missouri or from Missouri to Kansas
Title
Establishes the Incentives Regionalization Act to provide economic incentives to induce employers to relocate from Kansas to Missouri or from Missouri to Kansas
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (S) | |
2012-04-04 | Referred: Economic Development (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-28 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2044&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB2044I.htm |