MO HB2052 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a state agency in the process of letting bids on a state contract to award the contract to the bidder with the best value rather than the bidder with the lowest and best proposal
Title
Requires a state agency in the process of letting bids on a state contract to award the contract to the bidder with the best value rather than the bidder with the lowest and best proposal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2014-03-03 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2052&year=2014&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills141/biltxt/intro/HB2052I.htm |