MO HB2086 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration date from June 30, 2011, to December 31, 2011, for collection of the $0.50 fee on the sale of a lead-acid battery
Title
Extends the expiration date from June 30, 2011, to December 31, 2011, for collection of the $0.50 fee on the sale of a lead-acid battery
Sponsors
Rep. Don Ruzicka [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources (H) | |
2010-02-10 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-02-09 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2086&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB2086I.htm |