MO HB2756 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of the "Property Assessment Clean Energy Act"
Title
Modifies provisions of the "Property Assessment Clean Energy Act"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House: HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 105 N: 16 NV: 24 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2024-04-29 | House | Executive Session Held (S) |
2024-04-29 | House | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2024-04-25 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 29, 2024, 2:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 2. |
2024-04-25 | House | Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S) |
2024-04-22 | House | Read First Time (S) |
2024-04-18 | House | Delivered to the Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 105 NOES: 16 PRESENT: 24 |
2024-04-18 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2024-04-16 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted. |
2024-04-16 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2024-04-16 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2024-04-16 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-03-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2024-03-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-03-12 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-03-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2024-02-21 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-02-20 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |