MO HB65 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-15 - Referred: Elections(H)
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-01-15 - Referred: Elections(H)
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies that official ballot measure challenges must be adjudicated within 56 days before the election in which the measure will be voted on
Title
Specifies that official ballot measure challenges must be adjudicated within 56 days before the election in which the measure will be voted on
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Dugger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-15 | House | Referred: Elections(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB65&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0065I.PDF |