MO HR1365 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Adopted (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Adopted (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Turkish government to uphold and safeguard religious and human rights to its citizens and to respect the property and human rights of all religious and faith traditions
Title
Urges the Turkish government to uphold and safeguard religious and human rights to its citizens and to respect the property and human rights of all religious and faith traditions
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Bahr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Adopted (H) | |
2012-04-19 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-19 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-19 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-19 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-04-11 | Referred: Rules (H) | |
2012-03-21 | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HR1365&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HR1365I.htm |