MO HR959 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Adopted (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Adopted (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes May 3, 2012, as the "National Day of Prayer" and encourages all citizens of the State of Missouri to join in this recognition and observance of prayer for the welfare of this state
Title
Recognizes May 3, 2012, as the "National Day of Prayer" and encourages all citizens of the State of Missouri to join in this recognition and observance of prayer for the welfare of this state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Adopted (H) | |
2012-04-26 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-26 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-26 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-26 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-04-18 | Referred: Rules (H) | |
2012-03-05 | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HR959&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HR0959I.htm |