MO SB162 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 162-Munzlinger, with HCS#2, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 162-Munzlinger, with HCS#2, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions pertaining to agriculture
Title
Modifies provisions pertaining to agriculture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 162-Munzlinger, with HCS#2, as amended | |
2011-05-11 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2011-05-11 | HCS#2, as amended, H adopted | |
2011-05-11 | HA 6 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Jones-117)--(0830L06.12H) | |
2011-05-11 | HA 5 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Korman)--(0830L06.16H) | |
2011-05-11 | HA 4 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Loehner)--(0830L06.10H) | |
2011-05-11 | HA 3 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Klippenstein)--(0830L06.04H) | |
2011-05-11 | HA 2 to HCS#2, as amended, H adopted | |
2011-05-11 | HA 2 to HA 2 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Brattin)--(0830L06.17H) | |
2011-05-11 | HA 1 to HA 2 to HCS#2 H offered & defeated (Holsman)--(0830L06.14H) | |
2011-05-11 | HA 2 to HCS#2 H offered (Dugger)--(0830L06.11H) | |
2011-05-11 | HA 1 to HCS#2 H offered & adopted (Loehner)--(0830L06.05H) | |
2011-05-05 | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-05-05 | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-05-04 | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2011-05-04 | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-05-04 | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-05-03 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-05-03 | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass H Agri-Business Committee | |
2011-05-03 | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass H Agri-Business Committee | |
2011-04-14 | HCS Returned to Committee of origin | |
2011-04-07 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-07 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Agri-Business Committee - Consent | |
2011-04-07 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Agri-Business Committee - Consent | |
2011-04-05 | Hearing Conducted H Agri-Business Committee | |
2011-03-31 | Referred H Agri-Business Committee | |
2011-03-18 | H Second Read | |
2011-03-17 | H First Read | |
2011-03-17 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-03-16 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Perfected | |
2011-03-16 | SCS S adopted | |
2011-03-16 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-03-03 | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2011-03-02 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee - (0830S.02C) | |
2011-02-23 | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2011-01-27 | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2011-01-24 | S First Read--SB 162-Munzlinger |