MO SB208 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 208-Lager
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 208-Lager
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes any requirement that a telecommunications company must file tariffs and exempts compliance with certain state regulations when federal regulations exist
Title
Removes any requirement that a telecommunications company must file tariffs and exempts compliance with certain state regulations when federal regulations exist
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Lager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 208-Lager | |
2011-04-04 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-03-17 | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor | |
2011-02-23 | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2011-02-22 | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee | |
2011-02-01 | S First Read--SB 208-Lager |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4108886 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB208.pdf |