MO SB22 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 22-Nasheed, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 22-Nasheed, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies Missouri Supreme Court Rules relating to discovery in criminal cases
Title
Modifies Missouri Supreme Court Rules relating to discovery in criminal cases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 22-Nasheed, with SCS |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS |
2019-04-08 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (0496S.04C) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 22-Nasheed |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |