MO SB228 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 228-Koenig, with SS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 228-Koenig, with SS & SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the Year 2000 Retirement Plan for state employees, members of the General Assembly, and statewide elected officials employed after January 1, 2018
Title
Modifies the Year 2000 Retirement Plan for state employees, members of the General Assembly, and statewide elected officials employed after January 1, 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 228-Koenig, with SS & SA 1 (pending) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-07 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered (Schaaf)--(0505S05.03S) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | SS S offered (Koenig)--(0505S.05F) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Health and Pensions Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 228-Koenig |
2016-12-20 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57374317 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB228.pdf |