MO SB392 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 392-Holsman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 392-Holsman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the business hours of distilleries who offer drinks at retail on their premises
Title
Changes the business hours of distilleries who offer drinks at retail on their premises
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 392-Holsman |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Removed S Consent Calendar |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business and Industry Committee - Consent |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Small Business and Industry Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business and Industry Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 392-Holsman |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=59162613 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB392.pdf |