MO SB677 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 677-Luetkemeyer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 677-Luetkemeyer
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Narcotics Control Act and provides for the incineration of certain controlled substances
Title
Establishes the Narcotics Control Act and provides for the incineration of certain controlled substances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 677-Luetkemeyer |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 677-Luetkemeyer |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26838058 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB677.pdf |