MO SB782 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 14 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - S Bills with H Amendments--SB 782-Brown, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to transportation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to transportation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Reconsider (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House: SB 782 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 138 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House: SB 782 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House: SB 782 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 139 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House: SB 782 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 118 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House: SB 782 (HA 7) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - House - House: SB 782 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 118 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-15HouseS Bills with H Amendments--SB 782-Brown, with HCS, as amended
2020-05-14HouseMotion to reconsider the vote by which HCS, as amended was adopted - S adopted (Schatz)
2020-05-14SenateMotion to reconsider the vote by which SB 782 was Third Read and Passed be reconsidered - S adopted (Schatz)
2020-05-14SenateMotion to reconsider the vote by which the title be agreed to - S adopted (Schatz)
2020-05-14SenateMotion to reconsider the vote by which HCS for SB 782, as amended was passed be reconsidered - S adopted (Schatz)
2020-05-14SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2020-05-14HouseS Third Read and Passed
2020-05-14HouseS concurs in HCS, as amended
2020-05-13HouseH Third Read and Passed
2020-05-13HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2020-05-13HouseHA 2 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(4375H03.22H)
2020-05-13HouseHA 1 to HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Knight)--(4375H03.31H)
2020-05-13HouseMotion to reconsider HA 2 to HCS H adopted
2020-05-13HouseMotion to reconsider HCS, as amended, H Adopted
2020-05-13HouseMotion to reconsider H Third Reading Vote H adopted
2020-05-13HouseH Third Read and Passed
2020-05-13HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2020-05-13HouseHA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Sharp-36)--(4375H03.03H)
2020-05-13HouseHA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Busick)--(4375H03.01H)
2020-05-13HouseHA 6 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(4375H03.02H)
2020-05-13HouseHA 1 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(4375H03.27H)
2020-05-13HouseHA 6 to HCS H offered (Ruth)--(4375H03.02H)
2020-05-13HouseHA 5 to HCS, as amended, H adopted--(4375H03.10H)
2020-05-13HouseHA 1 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Basye)--(4375H03.26H)
2020-05-13HouseHA 5 to HCS H offered (Wiemann)--(4375H03.10H)
2020-05-13HouseHA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Kolkmeyer)--(4375H03.23H)
2020-05-13HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Scharpe-4)--(4375H03.16H)
2020-05-13HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Ruth)--(4375H03.22H)
2020-05-13HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Knight)--(4375H03.15H)
2020-05-12HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-12HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2020-05-11HouseReferred H Fiscal Review Committee
2020-05-11HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2020-05-11HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2020-05-06HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2020-05-06HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Transportation
2020-05-06HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Transportation
2020-05-06HouseHearing Conducted H Transportation
2020-05-01HouseReferred H Transportation
2020-05-01HouseH Second Read
2020-04-30HouseH First Read
2020-04-29SenateS Third Read and Passed - Consent
2020-03-12SenateReported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent
2020-03-12SenateMotion to pass bill as consent taken by S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee - Consent vote adopted
2020-03-12SenateVoted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2020-02-27SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2020-02-13SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 782-Brown
2019-12-11SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=27170306
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB782.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/perf/SB782.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/House/HCS-SB/SB0782.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/RDay450429760-785.pdf#779
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/062.010.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/062.009.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/062.023.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/062.022.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/062.021.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/rollcalls/062.020.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/RDay5605141125-1199.pdf#1196
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/RDay5605141125-1199.pdf#1127
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/RDay5605141125-1199.pdf#1128

Bill Comments

feedback