MO SB83 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows for the sale of deficiency waiver addendums and other similar products with respect to certain loan transactions
Title
Allows for the sale of deficiency waiver addendums and other similar products with respect to certain loan transactions
Sponsors
Sen. David Pearce [R] | Rep. Don Wells [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by Senate President | |
2011-05-26 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2011-05-04 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-04 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2011-04-27 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-27 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2011-04-07 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee | |
2011-04-07 | Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee | |
2011-04-06 | Hearing Conducted H Financial Institutions Committee | |
2011-03-31 | Referred H Financial Institutions Committee | |
2011-03-03 | H Second Read | |
2011-03-02 | H First Read | |
2011-03-02 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Perfected | |
2011-02-24 | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor | |
2011-02-14 | Removed S Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-10 | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor - Consent | |
2011-02-07 | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - Consent | |
2011-01-31 | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2011-01-06 | S First Read--SB 83-Pearce |