MS HB1549 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Jackson County, Mississippi, To Join With The Governing Authorities Of The City Of Pascagoula, Mississippi, To Create The Lapointe-krebs Foundation, Inc., For The Preservation, Maintenance, Upkeep And Operation Of The Lapointe-krebs House; To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors To Contribute To The Lapointe-krebs Foundation For Certain Purposes; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Jackson County and the City of Pascagoula; may jointly create the LaPointe-Krebs Foundation, Inc.
Sponsors
Rep. Billy Broomfield [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Guice [R] | Rep. Frank Hamilton [R] | Rep. Brandon Jones [D] |
Rep. Deryk Parker [D] | Rep. John Read [R] | Rep. Henry Zuber [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-22 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-22 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-18 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-18 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-18 | Passed | |
2011-03-17 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-03-17 | Referred To Local and Private | |
2011-03-16 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-16 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-16 | Passed | |
2011-03-16 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-03-16 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-03-02 | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |