MS HB1609 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Person Who Is Otherwise A Qualified Elector And Has Been Convicted Of Certain Disenfranchising Crimes, Except For Arson, Armed Robbery, Carjacking, Embezzlement, Bribery, Perjury, Murder, Rape, Statutory Rape, Sexual Battery, Or Human Trafficking Shall Have His Or Her Right To Vote Revoked, But Shall Have The Right To Vote Restored Five Years After Release From Confinement For The Disqualifying Crime, Or Five Years From The Date Of Such Conviction, Whichever Occurs Later; To Amend Sections 23-15-19, 23-15-125, 23-15-151, 23-15-153 And 23-15-165, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Section; To Bring Forward Sections 97-39-3 And 99-19-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; To Amend Section 97-37-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide An Exception To The Firearms Prohibition For Persons Who Have Had Their Voting Rights Restored; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Voting rights; restore for certain disqualifying crimes.
Sponsors
Rep. Kabir Karriem [D] | Rep. Price Wallace [R] | Rep. Fred Shanks [R] | Rep. Zakiya Summers [D] |
Rep. Rickey Thompson [D] | Rep. Carl Mickens [D] | Rep. John Faulkner [D] | Rep. Oscar Denton [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 96 N: 11 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Referred To Constitution;Judiciary, Division B |
2024-03-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2024-03-07 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Yates, Wallace, Taylor) |
2024-03-07 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-03-07 | House | Amended |
2024-03-07 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-19 | House | Referred To Constitution |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 15 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 153 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
97 | 37 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
97 | 39 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
99 | 19 | 37 | New Code | See Bill Text |