MS HB761 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-27-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Procedure Required To Object To A Coastal Wetlands Permit Application Related To Activities On Coastal Wetlands; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Public hearings for coastal wetland permits; revise procedure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-08 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-08 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-03 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-02 | Passed | |
2011-02-24 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-02-09 | Referred To Ports and Marine Resources | |
2011-02-09 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-07 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-02-07 | Amended | |
2011-02-07 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-13 | Referred To Marine Resources |