MS HB796 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create Pre-election Day Voting Act; To Provide Definitions; To Provide That The Pre-election Day Voting Period Shall Begin Fourteen Days Before The Election And Continue Until Noon On The Saturday Immediately Preceding The Election; To Provide That Pre-election Day Voting Shall Be For Each Primary, General, Runoff, Special And Municipal Election For Public Office; To Provide The Hours For Pre-election Day Voting In The Registrar's Office During Regular Business Hours; To Provide Extended Hours To Vote During The Last Full Week Preceding An Election; To Provide That Notice Of Pre-election Day Voting Shall Be Provided In Three Public Places Eight Days Before The Voting Begins; To Provide The Procedures To Follow When Casting A Ballot During The Pre-election Day Voting Period; To Provide The Manner For Challenging The Qualifications Of A Voter During The Pre-election Day Voting Period; To Amend Sections 23-15-625, 23-15-627, 23-15-629, 23-15-631, 23-15-635, 23-15-637, 23-15-639, 23-15-641, 23-15-643, 23-15-647, 23-15-649, 23-15-657, 23-15-713, 23-15-715, 23-15-717, 23-15-719, 23-15-721 And 23-15-735, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Voters Who Are Eligible To Vote By Absentee Ballot; To Prohibit A Voter From Casting An Absentee Ballot In Person At The Office Of The County Registrar; To Conform To The Provisions Of This Act; To Amend Sections 23-15-31, 23-15-37, 23-15-43, 23-15-47, 23-15-65, 23-15-127, 23-15-153, 23-15-171, 23-15-173, 23-15-191, 23-15-195, 23-15-197, 23-15-231, 23-15-233, 23-15-239, 23-15-241, 23-15-245, 23-15-247, 23-15-251, 23-15-255, 23-15-263, 23-15-265, 23-15-267, 23-15-303, 23-15-309, 23-15-331, 23-15-333, 23-15-335, 23-15-353, 23-15-357, 23-15-359, 23-15-363, 23-15-367, 7-3-39, 23-15-407, 23-15-411, 23-15-415, 23-15-417, 23-15-425, 23-15-429, 23-15-437, 23-15-469, 23-15-473, 23-15-511, 23-15-515, 23-15-531.4, 23-15-531.6, 23-15-531.7, 23-15-545, 23-15-573, 23-15-613, 23-15-781, 23-15-785, 23-15-807, 23-15-833, 23-15-843, 23-15-851, 23-15-853, 23-15-855, 23-15-857, 23-15-859, 23-15-895, 23-15-913, 23-15-963, 23-15-977, 23-15-1031, 23-15-1081, 23-15-1083, 23-15-1085, 23-15-1091, 21-3-3, 21-9-17, 37-5-9, 37-5-63, 37-5-7, 21-8-7 And 9-4-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Provisions Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Pre-election day voting; allow.
Sponsors
Rep. William Denny [R] | Rep. Kimberly Campbell [D] | Rep. Deborah Butler Dixon [D] | Rep. Christopher Bell [D] |
Rep. Thomas Reynolds [D] | Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] | Rep. Earle Banks [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Elections |
2016-03-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-03-03 | House | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-03 | House | Amended |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-02-25 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-02-18 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |