MS HB934 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 57-105-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of The Term "credit Allocation Date" For Purposes Of The Qualified Equity Investment Tax Credit Program; To Revise The Type And Amount Of Investments That A Qualified Community Development Entity Must Certify To The Mississippi Development Authority When Applying For Qualified Equity Investment Tax Credits; To Revise Provisions Relating To The Time Within Which A Qualified Community Development Entity Allocated A Qualified Equity Investment Tax Credit Must Issue The Qualified Equity Investment For Which The Credit Was Allocated; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Qualified equity investment tax credit; revise certain provisions regarding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-03-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,Longwitz,Chassaniol |
2013-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Smith (39th),Rogers (61st),Reynolds |
2013-03-21 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Amended |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2013-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-12 | House | Passed |
2013-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |