MS HC118 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing November 9, 2011, As "diabetic Peripheral Neuropathy (dpn) Awareness Day In Mississippi" To Bring Attention To Diabetes Management Programs.
Title
Diabetic Peripheral Neuropathy (DPN) Awareness Day in Mississippi; recognize November 9, 2011, as.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-28 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-28 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-28 | Adopted | |
2011-03-27 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-03-23 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-23 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-23 | Adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Referred To Rules |