MS HC125 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-30 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Center Hill High School For Receiving Academic All-state Team Awards For All 16 Of Its Athletic Teams.
Title
Center Hill High School; commend for receiving Academic All-State Team awards for all 16 of its athletic teams.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Hamilton [R] | Rep. Wanda Jennings [R] | Rep. W.T. Mayhall [R] | Rep. Brad Mayo [R] |
Rep. Tommy Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-28 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-28 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-28 | Adopted | |
2011-03-27 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-03-24 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-24 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-24 | Adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Referred To Rules |