MS SB2285 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Conference Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Conference Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Bring Forward Section 45-1-12, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Is The Provision Of Law That Sets Out The Salary Schedule Of Officers Of The Mississippi Highway Patrol And The Mississippi Bureau Of Narcotics, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Bring Forward Section 45-3-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Is The Provision Of Law That Establishes The "david R. Huggins Act," For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Department of Public Safety; bring forward code sections related to officer salaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Read,Deweese,Cockerham |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Wiggins,Polk |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-03-27 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-03-26 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-03-26 | House | Amended |
2024-03-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-26 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To A2 |
2024-03-26 | House | DR - TSDPAA: A2 To AP |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred To Appropriations C;Appropriations A |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 1 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 3 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |