MS SB2523 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-16)
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-16)
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 45-2-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Death Benefit Payable From The Law Enforcement Officers And Fire Fighters Death Benefits Trust Fund For Law Enforcement Officers And Firefighters Killed In The Line Of Duty; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Law enforcement officers and firefighters; increase the death benefits payable to.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-06-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |