MS SB2733 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Mississippi Wholesale Prescription Drug Importation Program; To Provide That The Division Of Medicaid Shall Establish The Program To Provide Prescription Drugs Available Outside Of The United States To Consumers In The State At A Lower Cost; To Require The Division To Contract With One Or More Prescription Drug Wholesalers And Canadian Suppliers To Import Prescription Drugs; To Require The Division To Develop A Registration Process For Health Benefit Plans; To Require Providers And Pharmacies To Obtain And Dispense Such Drugs; To Require The Division To Comply With Certain Federal Laws Regulating Such Programs; To Provide That A Prescription Drug May Be Imported Into The State Only If The Drug Meets F.d.a. Standards And Does Not Violate Federal Patent Laws, Among Other Requirements; To Require The Division To Monitor Any Potential Anticompetitive Activities Affected By The Program; To Authorize The Division To Impose A Fee On Each Prescription Drug Sold Under The Program; To Require The Director Of The Division To Develop Auditing Procedures; To Require The Division To Submit A Report On The Program To The Legislature And Governor Each Year; To Create New Section 73-21-158, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Each Drug Manufacturer To Submit A Quarterly Report To The Commissioner Of The Department Of Insurance With The Current Wholesale Acquisition Cost Information For The Prescription Drugs Sold In The State By That Manufacturer; To Set Certain Other Reporting Requirements, Including The Name Of The Drug And Aggregate Rebate Amounts; To Require Pharmacy Benefit Managers Providing Services For A Health Care Plan And Each Health Insurer To Submit Certain Reports To The Commissioner; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Pharmaceuticals; authorize the Division of Medicaid to establish a wholesale prescription drug importation program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2024-03-18 | House | Referred To Medicaid;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred To Medicaid |