MS SC679 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Career Of Ernest "sonny" Cadden, Former Band Director At Amory High School In Amory, Mississippi, On The Occasion Of His Retirement.
Title
Recognize Ernest "Sonny" Cadden, former Band Director at Amory High School.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-30 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-29 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-03-29 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-29 | Adopted | |
2011-03-28 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-28 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-03-28 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-03-28 | Immediate Release | |
2011-03-28 | Adopted | |
2011-03-27 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-03-27 | Referred To Rules |