MT HB149 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-27 - (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Generally revise fishing derby laws

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Generally revise fishing derby laws

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-27House(H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal
2015-01-22House(H) Tabled in Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks
2015-01-13House(H) Hearing (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks
2015-01-07 (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically
2015-01-06House(H) First Reading
2015-01-06House(H) Referred to Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks
2015-01-06House(H) Introduced
2015-01-05 (C) Draft Delivered to Requester
2015-01-05 (C) Draft Ready for Delivery
2014-12-30 (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review
2014-12-30 (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review
2014-12-30 (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically
2014-12-30 (C) Draft in Input/Proofing
2014-12-29 (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH]
2014-12-29 (C) Draft in Legal Review
2014-12-26 (C) Draft On Hold
2014-12-11 (C) Draft to Requester for Review
2014-12-05 (C) Draft Request Received

Subjects


Montana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback