MT HB225 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Funding of maintenance for paved paths
Title
Funding of maintenance for paved paths
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - Senate - (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - (H) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 27 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - Senate - (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (Y: 27 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 62 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended (Y: 67 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - (H) Local Government Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2017-05-03 | House | (H) Signed by Governor |
2017-05-01 | House | (H) Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-29 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2017-04-26 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-18 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2017-04-18 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2017-04-13 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2017-04-12 | Senate | (S) Returned to House |
2017-04-11 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-11 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-04-10 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2017-04-10 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-04-08 | Senate | (S) Taken from Committee; Placed on 2nd Reading (S) Highways and Transportation |
2017-04-04 | Senate | (S) Committee Vote Failed; Remains in Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2017-04-04 | Senate | (S) Taken from Table in Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2017-03-21 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2017-03-21 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-03-21 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-03-20 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2017-03-16 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-03-16 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Highways and Transportation |
2017-03-09 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Highways and Transportation |
2017-03-09 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-08 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2017-03-08 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2017-03-07 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-22 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-22 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2017-02-21 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Appropriations |
2017-02-16 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2017-02-14 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-14 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2017-02-14 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed as Amended |
2017-02-14 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Motion to Amend Carried |
2017-02-14 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2017-02-13 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-02-13 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-02-13 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2017-02-09 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2017-02-08 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Local Government |
2017-02-08 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-02-07 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Local Government |
2017-01-26 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Local Government |
2017-01-23 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2017-01-20 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2017-01-19 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2017-01-12 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Local Government |
2017-01-12 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Local Government |
2017-01-11 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-11 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2017-01-11 | House | (H) Introduced |
2017-01-09 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2017-01-06 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2017-01-06 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2017-01-06 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2017-01-06 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2017-01-06 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2017-01-06 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2017-01-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2017-01-05 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SMH] | |
2017-01-03 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2017-01-02 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2016-12-30 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2016-11-30 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2016-11-11 | (C) Draft Request Received |