MT HB398 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (H) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise tax laws to allow tax credits related to alternative fuel motor vehicles
Title
Revise tax laws to allow tax credits related to alternative fuel motor vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (H) Died in Standing Committee | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal | |
2011-03-09 | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Taxation | |
2011-03-03 | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation | |
2011-02-10 | (H) Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-02-09 | (H) Fiscal Note Signed | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-02-02 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation | |
2011-02-02 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-02-02 | (H) Introduced | |
2011-02-01 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-01-28 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-01-27 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-01-27 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-01-26 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-01-26 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-01-26 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2011-01-24 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-01-24 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2011-01-13 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2011-01-06 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-12-27 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Motor Vehicles
Revenue, State
Rule Making
Taxation (Generally)
Taxation--Corporations
Taxation--Individual Income
Revenue, State
Rule Making
Taxation (Generally)
Taxation--Corporations
Taxation--Individual Income
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/laws11/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=398&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2011/hb0399/HB0398_1.pdf |