MT HB416 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Taxation
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Provide military income tax exemption
Title
Provide military income tax exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - (H) Appropriations Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - House - (H) Taxation Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | Senate | (S) Died in Standing Committee (S) Taxation |
2015-04-15 | Senate | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Taxation |
2015-04-15 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation |
2015-04-01 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation |
2015-04-01 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Passed |
2015-03-31 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2015-03-30 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-30 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Passed |
2015-03-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2015-03-26 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-03-26 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-03-26 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2015-03-25 | House | (H) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-03-24 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Taxation |
2015-03-24 | House | (H) Taken from Table in Committee (H) Taxation |
2015-03-09 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Taxation |
2015-02-17 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation |
2015-02-12 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2015-02-12 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed |
2015-02-11 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2015-02-06 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2015-02-06 | House | (H) Introduced |
2015-02-04 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2015-01-29 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2015-01-29 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2015-01-29 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2015-01-29 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2015-01-29 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2015-01-28 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [CMD] | |
2015-01-28 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2015-01-28 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2015-01-09 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2015-01-07 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2015-01-07 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2015-01-05 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2014-12-10 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2014-12-05 | (C) Draft Request Received |