MT HB614 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Died in Standing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise new construction energy credit provisions
Title
Revise new construction energy credit provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 69 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (S) Died in Standing Committee | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Tabled in Committee (S) Taxation | |
2011-04-05 | (S) Hearing (S) Taxation | |
2011-03-30 | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Taxation | |
2011-03-30 | (S) First Reading | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Transmitted to Senate | |
2011-03-29 | (H) 3rd Reading Passed | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-28 | (H) 2nd Reading Passed | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-25 | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed (H) Taxation | |
2011-03-25 | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (H) Taxation | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Fiscal Note Printed | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Fiscal Note Received | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Hearing (H) Taxation | |
2011-03-16 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Fiscal Note Requested | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Taxation | |
2011-03-15 | (H) First Reading | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Introduced | |
2011-03-15 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2011-03-11 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2011-03-11 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2011-03-11 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2011-03-11 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2011-03-11 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2011-03-11 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2011-03-11 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2011-03-10 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2011-03-06 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2010-12-31 | (C) Draft Request Received |