MT HB77 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise campaign laws related to robo-calls
Title
Revise campaign laws related to robo-calls
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Ellis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2015-01-30 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) State Administration |
2015-01-21 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2015-01-09 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed (H) State Administration |
2015-01-05 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Signed (H) State Administration |
2015-01-05 | House | (H) First Reading |
2015-01-02 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2014-12-23 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2014-12-15 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2014-12-11 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-11 | House | (H) Introduced |
2014-12-08 | (C) Pre-Introduction Letter Sent | |
2014-12-08 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2014-12-08 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2014-12-08 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2014-12-03 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2014-12-03 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2014-12-03 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2014-12-03 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2014-12-01 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2014-08-21 | (C) Draft Request Received |
Subjects
Montana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://laws.leg.mt.gov/legprd/LAW0210W$BSIV.ActionQuery?P_BILL_NO1=77&P_BLTP_BILL_TYP_CD=HB&Z_ACTION=Find&P_SESS=20151 |
Text | https://leg.mt.gov/bills/2015/hb0099/HB0077_1.pdf |