MT HB843 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Free hunting/fishing for service members/veterans with 50% disability rating
Title
Free hunting/fishing for service members/veterans with 50% disability rating
Sponsors
Rep. Scot Kerns [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - House - (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for Revenue Bill Transmittal |
2023-03-31 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-31 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-31 | House | (H) Rereferred to Committee (H) Appropriations |
2023-03-31 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2023-03-31 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-03-30 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2023-03-30 | House | (H) Taken from Table in Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2023-03-28 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2023-03-23 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2023-03-23 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-03-22 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-03-21 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Unsigned |
2023-03-21 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-03-17 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-03-17 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Fish, Wildlife and Parks |
2023-03-16 | House | (H) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-03-16 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-03-16 | House | (H) Introduced |
2023-03-16 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2023-03-15 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-03-14 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-03-14 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-03-14 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-03-14 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-03-13 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-03-13 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-03-13 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-03-13 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-03-10 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-03-01 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-02-22 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-02-20 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2022-11-29 | (C) Draft Request Received |