MT HJ6 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - (H) Died in Process
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution encouraging implementation of I-166 provisions
Title
Resolution encouraging implementation of I-166 provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-27 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed (Y: 49 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | (H) Died in Process |
2013-02-28 | House | (H) Missed Deadline for General Bill Transmittal |
2013-02-27 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Not Passed |
2013-02-27 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-26 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-26 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2013-02-25 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2013-02-25 | House | (H) Taken from Table in Committee (H) Judiciary |
2013-02-01 | House | (H) Tabled in Committee (H) Judiciary |
2013-01-29 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2013-01-22 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Judiciary |
2013-01-18 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2013-01-18 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-01-17 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-16 | House | (H) Introduced |
2013-01-15 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-01-15 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-01-15 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-01-14 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-01-14 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-14 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-01-14 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [JLN] | |
2013-01-14 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-01-14 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2013-01-09 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-11-27 | (C) Draft Back for Requester Changes | |
2012-11-09 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-11-09 | (C) Draft Request Received |