MT HR5 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - (H) Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution honoring Chuck Johnson
Title
Resolution honoring Chuck Johnson
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - (H) Resolution Adopted (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - (H) State Administration Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | (H) Filed with Secretary of State |
2023-04-29 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-26 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2023-04-24 | House | (H) Returned from Enrolling |
2023-04-20 | House | (H) Sent to Enrolling |
2023-04-20 | House | (H) Resolution Adopted |
2023-04-20 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-03-30 | House | (H) Committee Report--Resolution Adopted (H) State Administration |
2023-03-30 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Resolution Adopted (H) State Administration |
2023-03-30 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2023-03-25 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-03-25 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2023-03-24 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-03-24 | House | (H) Introduced |
2023-03-24 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2023-03-16 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-03-16 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-03-16 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-03-16 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-03-15 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-03-15 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-03-15 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-03-15 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-03-14 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-03-14 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-03-13 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2023-03-10 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2023-01-26 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2022-12-11 | (C) Draft Request Received |