MT SB149 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish penalties for false reporting in child protective services cases
Title
Establish penalties for false reporting in child protective services cases
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Lenz [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 34 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - (H) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-17 - Senate - (S) Judiciary Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2023-05-19 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2023-05-11 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2023-05-11 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2023-05-10 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2023-05-08 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2023-05-08 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2023-05-05 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-05-02 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2023-05-02 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2023-05-02 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2023-05-02 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2023-05-02 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-05-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-05-01 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2023-05-01 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-04-27 | House | (H) Conference Committee Report Received Conference Committee on SB 149 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Report Received Conference Committee on SB 149 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | (S) Hearing Conference Committee on SB 149 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled Conference Committee on SB 149 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | (S) Hearing Conference Committee on SB 149 |
2023-04-24 | House | (H) Conference Committee Appointed |
2023-04-21 | Senate | (S) Conference Committee Appointed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred |
2023-04-20 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2023-04-05 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2023-04-05 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2023-04-04 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2023-03-29 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2023-03-29 | (C) Fiscal Note Unsigned | |
2023-03-28 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2023-03-21 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2023-03-21 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2023-03-21 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2023-03-21 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Judiciary |
2023-03-20 | (C) Amendments Available | |
2023-03-16 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Judiciary |
2023-03-11 | House | (H) First Reading |
2023-03-11 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Judiciary |
2023-01-24 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2023-01-23 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2023-01-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2023-01-20 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2023-01-18 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2023-01-17 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed (S) Judiciary |
2023-01-13 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Judiciary |
2023-01-11 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2023-01-11 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-11 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Judiciary |
2023-01-10 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2023-01-09 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-06 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2023-01-06 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2023-01-06 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2023-01-05 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2023-01-05 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2023-01-05 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2023-01-05 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2023-01-04 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review | |
2023-01-04 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2023-01-04 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2022-10-03 | (C) Draft Request Received |