MT SB201 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revise requirements to hold a mining permit
Title
Revise requirements to hold a mining permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - (H) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - (S) Natural Resources Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2019-05-13 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2019-05-08 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-07 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2019-04-29 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2019-04-26 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2019-04-26 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2019-04-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-04-25 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-25 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-25 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Free Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-24 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-24 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Report Received (S) Free Conference |
2019-04-24 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Report Received (S) Free Conference |
2019-04-24 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Free Conference |
2019-04-23 | Senate | (S) Hearing Canceled (S) Free Conference |
2019-04-18 | House | (H) Free Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | (S) Free Conference Committee Appointed (S) Free Conference |
2019-04-17 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Not Concurred |
2019-04-17 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-11 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-08 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2019-04-08 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-08 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-04-05 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2019-04-05 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-04-04 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-04-04 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Natural Resources |
2019-04-03 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) Natural Resources |
2019-03-22 | House | (H) Hearing (H) Natural Resources |
2019-03-06 | House | (H) Hearing Canceled (H) Natural Resources |
2019-02-28 | House | (H) First Reading (H) Natural Resources |
2019-02-28 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) Natural Resources |
2019-02-27 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2019-02-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2019-02-27 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2019-02-25 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2019-02-25 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources |
2019-02-22 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) Natural Resources |
2019-02-08 | (C) Legal Review Note | |
2019-02-06 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) Natural Resources |
2019-02-04 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) Natural Resources |
2019-02-02 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2019-02-01 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2019-02-01 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2019-02-01 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2019-02-01 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2019-02-01 | (C) Executive Director Final Review | |
2019-01-31 | (C) Draft in Assembly | |
2019-01-31 | (C) Executive Director Review | |
2019-01-31 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2019-01-31 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [KWK] | |
2019-01-30 | (C) Draft in Edit | |
2019-01-25 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2019-01-25 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2019-01-18 | (C) Draft Taken Off Hold | |
2018-12-11 | (C) Draft On Hold | |
2018-11-06 | (C) Draft Request Received |