MT SB242 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Chapter Number Assigned
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establish an award of valorous service for Montanans KIA or MIA in line of duty
Title
Establish an award of valorous service for Montanans KIA or MIA in line of duty
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Sesso [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-03 - House - (H) 3rd Reading Concurred (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - (H) 2nd Reading Concurred (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - (S) 3rd Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-23 - Senate - (S) 2nd Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Chapter Number Assigned | |
2013-04-24 | Senate | (S) Signed by Governor |
2013-04-16 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to Governor |
2013-04-15 | House | (H) Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-15 | Senate | (S) Signed by President |
2013-04-12 | (C) Printed - Enrolled Version Available | |
2013-04-12 | (C) Clerical Corrections Made - New Version Available | |
2013-04-12 | Senate | (S) Returned from Enrolling |
2013-04-11 | Senate | (S) Sent to Enrolling |
2013-04-11 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed as Amended by House |
2013-04-11 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading House Amendments Concurred |
2013-04-10 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-04-04 | House | (H) Returned to Senate with Amendments |
2013-04-03 | House | (H) 3rd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-03 | House | (H) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-04-02 | House | (H) 2nd Reading Concurred |
2013-04-02 | House | (H) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-03-21 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-03-21 | House | (H) Committee Report--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) State Administration |
2013-03-21 | House | (H) Committee Executive Action--Bill Concurred as Amended (H) State Administration |
2013-03-14 | House | (H) Hearing (H) State Administration |
2013-03-07 | House | (H) First Reading |
2013-03-07 | House | (H) Referred to Committee (H) State Administration |
2013-02-27 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-02-26 | Senate | (S) Transmitted to House |
2013-02-25 | Senate | (S) 3rd Reading Passed |
2013-02-25 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Received |
2013-02-25 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 3rd Reading |
2013-02-23 | Senate | (S) 2nd Reading Passed |
2013-02-23 | Senate | (S) Scheduled for 2nd Reading |
2013-02-21 | Senate | (S) Revised Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-02-21 | (C) Printed - New Version Available | |
2013-02-21 | Senate | (S) Committee Report--Bill Passed as Amended (S) State Administration |
2013-02-20 | Senate | (S) Committee Executive Action--Bill Passed as Amended (S) State Administration |
2013-02-13 | Senate | (S) Hearing (S) State Administration |
2013-02-11 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Printed |
2013-02-09 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Signed |
2013-02-08 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Received |
2013-02-04 | Senate | (S) Referred to Committee (S) State Administration |
2013-02-04 | Senate | (S) First Reading |
2013-02-04 | Senate | (S) Fiscal Note Requested |
2013-02-04 | (C) Introduced Bill Text Available Electronically | |
2013-02-02 | Senate | (S) Introduced |
2013-02-02 | (C) Draft Delivered to Requester | |
2013-01-21 | (C) Draft Ready for Delivery | |
2013-01-21 | (C) Fiscal Note Probable | |
2013-01-21 | (C) Draft in Assembly/Executive Director Review | |
2013-01-21 | (C) Draft in Final Drafter Review | |
2013-01-18 | (C) Bill Draft Text Available Electronically | |
2013-01-18 | (C) Draft in Input/Proofing | |
2013-01-18 | (C) Draft to Drafter - Edit Review [SAB] | |
2013-01-17 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-01-17 | (C) Draft Back for Redo | |
2013-01-17 | (C) Draft in Legal Review | |
2013-01-03 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-12-28 | (C) Draft to Requester for Review | |
2012-05-08 | (C) Draft Request Received |